Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/23/2017 at 20:41:18 (UTC).

PTN FOR SUSANNE SARTORIO

Case Summary

On 08/23/2012 PTN FOR SUSANNE SARTORIO was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1364

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SUSANNE SARTORIO

Concord, CA 94520

Other

JACOB ANTHONY GARVEY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2012
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2012
  • DECREE CHANGING NAME FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2012
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: NAME CHANGE FILED BY NAME CHANGE; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2012
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED; DATES OF PUBLICATION: 9/21/12. 9/28/12, 10/5/12, 10/12/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2012
  • NAME CHANGE TRANSMITTAL RETURNED FROM SHERIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • NAME CHANGE TRANSMITTAL SENT TO SHERIFF FOR APPLICANT - SUSANNE SARTORIO; AKA: NO AKAS MINOR; DATE OF BIRTH: 12/01/00; GENDER: MALE; HEARING DATE: 10/22/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • HEARING ON OSC WAS SET FOR 10/22/12 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • OSC TO/FOR NAME CHANGE FILED BY SUSANNE SARTORIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS PINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • (U.J.) PETITION TO/FOR SUSANNE SARTORIO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less