This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/26/2019 at 21:55:54 (UTC).

PSC INDUSTRIAL OUTSOURCING, LP VS BENNINGTON GROUP

Case Summary

On 08/05/2011 PSC INDUSTRIAL OUTSOURCING, LP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BENNINGTON GROUP. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0845

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PSC INDUSTRIAL OUTSOURCING, LP

Defendants and Cross Defendants

BENNINGTON GROUP, LLC

ABUL SHAH

GENON DELTA,LLC

BENNINGTON GROUP WEST, INC

BERKLEY REGIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

MIRANT MARSH LANDING, LLC

GENON ENERGY, INC.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

GENON DELTA,LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONES, KENNETH G

2121 N. California Blvd. Suite 875

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

ERGO, RICHARD A

2121 N California Blvd Suite 875

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2015
  • SPECIAL SET HEARING ON: RELATED CASE C10-02755 SET BY DEPT. 9; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • SPECIAL SET HEARING ON: RELATED CASE C10-02755 SET BY DEPT. 9; Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • SPECIAL SET HEARING ON: RELATED CASE C10-02755 SET BY DEPT. 9; Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • SPECIAL SET HEARING ON: RELATED CASE C10-02755 SET BY DEPT. 9; Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • SPECIAL SET HEARING ON: RELATED CASE SET BY DEPT. 9; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • SPECIAL SET HEARING ON: RELATED CASE C10-02755 SET BY DEPT 9; Disposition: DROPPED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • DEFAULT DEPARTMENT CHANGED TO 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • SPECIAL SET HEARING ON: RELATED CASE C10-02755 SET BY DEPT 9; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • SPECIAL SET HEARING ON: RELATED CASE C10-02755 SET BY DEPT 9; Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • DEFAULT DEPARTMENT CHANGED TO 17

    Read MoreRead Less
157 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2011
  • FEE RECEIVED FOR DEC AND ORDER FOR EXT OF TIME TO SERVE COMPLAINT FROM PSC INDUSTRIAL OUTSOURCING, LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2011
  • DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2011
  • TO 103 - ORDER EXTEND TIME TO SERVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2011
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2011
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/08/2011 OF PSC INDUSTRIAL OUTSOURCING, LP FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2011
  • COLOR OF FILE IS RED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2011
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 6/13/11 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2011
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2011
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2011
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 8/26/11 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GENON DELTA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BENNINGTON GROUP, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RELIANT ENRGY INC is a litigant

Latest cases where P S C Industrial Outsourcing L P is a litigant