This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/27/2019 at 01:12:58 (UTC).

PROGRESSIVE VS HERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 12/22/2016 PROGRESSIVE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********4695

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROGRESSIVE SELECTINSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

ERIC HERNANDEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NIVINSKUS, MARK R

134 W. Wilshire

Fullerton, CA 92832

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2018
  • CERTIFICATE OF FACTS ISSUED RE UNSATISFIED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • JUDGMENT BY COURT BY DEFAULT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT DISMISS CASE FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAULT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/22/2016 OF PROGRESSIVE SELECTINSURANCE COMPANY FILED AS TO ERIC HERNANDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/22/2016 OF PROGRESSIVE SELECTINSURANCE COMPANY AGAINST DEFENDANT ERIC HERNANDEZ BY CLERK AS REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED AS TO ALL REMAINING DOES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DECLARATION 585D CCP FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT; Disposition: OSC ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT WAS SET FOR 4/10/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF COMPLAINT FILED 12/22/2016 OF PROGRESSIVE SELECTINSURANCE COMPANY AS TO ERIC HERNANDEZ WITH DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE AND DECLARATION OF MAILING ON 01/24/17 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS PINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/22/2016 OF PROGRESSIVE SELECTINSURANCE COMPANY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 5/10/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 2/27/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • COMPLAINT FILED; SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.