This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/22/2017 at 11:46:16 (UTC).

PROBUILDERS VS. BEDROCK

Case Summary

On 05/03/2017 PROBUILDERS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BEDROCK. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1741

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

PROBUILDERS SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, RR

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

BEDROCK MASONRY INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

BEMIS, GARY A

3870 La Sierra Ave, Suite 239

Riverside, CA 92505

CAMPO, JOHN R

643 Bair Island Road Suite 400

Redwood City, CA 94064-2159

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

MORALES, RAMIRO

2300 Contra Costa Blvd., Suite 310

Pleasant Hill, CA 94523

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2017
  • CHECK FOR DISMISSAL ON UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • HEARING ON DEMURRER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 05/03/2017 OF BEDROCK MASONRY INC. FILED BY PROBUILDERS SPECIALTY INSURANCECOMPANY, RR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: DEMURRER (SEE LIST OF ADDL DOCS); TO - SEE LIST; MAIL DATE: 5/25/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • CLERK`S TICKLER WAS SET FOR 7/20/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • NOTICE OF/TO UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY BEDROCK MASONRY INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • HEARING ON DEMURRER WAS SET FOR 6/29/17 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS FILED ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PROBUILDERS SPECIALTY INSURANCECOMPANY, RR ON BEHALF OF PROBUILDERS SPECIALTY INSURANCECOMPANY, RR NAMING JOHN R CAMPO AS CO-COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • REQUEST OF PROBUILDERS SPECIALTY INSURANCECOMPANY, RR FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2016
  • CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT WAS SET FOR 12/08/16 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/13/2016 OF PROBUILDERS SPECIALTY INSURANCECOMPANY, RR AS TO BEDROCK MASONRY INC. WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/02/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/13/2016 OF PROBUILDERS SPECIALTY INSURANCECOMPANY, RR FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 1/31/17 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 11/17/16 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROBUILDERS SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY RRG is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORALES, RAMIRO