Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/28/2019 at 08:21:28 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO VS SANDOVAL

Case Summary

On 08/23/2012 PORTFOLIO filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SANDOVAL. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********5975

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC

Defendant

EMMA SANDOVAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RUNDQUIST, ANDREW P

5030 Camino De La Siesta Suite 340

San Diego, CA 92108

PIERCE, EMILY

4330 La Jolla Village Drive Suite 310

San Diego, CA 92122

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2018
  • ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS FILED ON THE CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CMPL (CRC 3.740) FILED 08/23/2012 OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC ON BEHALF OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC NAMING EMILY PIERCE AS CO-COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2013
  • JUDGMENT FILED/ENTERED-BEFORE TRIAL ON 09/03/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2013
  • CLERK'S TICKLER ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CASE - CHECK FOR FILING OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN 360 DAYS OF FILING COMPLAINT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2013
  • TO 103 - JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • JUDGMENT TO D33 FOR RVW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2013
  • REQUEST FOR CLERK/COURT JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2013
  • CLERK'S TICKLER ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CASE - CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE FILED WITHIN 180 DAYS OF FILING COMPLAINT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2013
  • SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION CCP 585(D) FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2013
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED AS TO ALL REMAINING DOES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2013
  • DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF FILED RE: IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT CCP 585(D)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2012
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CMPL (CRC 3.740) FILED 08/23/2012 OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC AS TO EMMA SANDOVAL WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/21/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2012
  • PLACED ON CLERK'S TICKLER CALENDAR FOR 3/07/13, AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2012
  • PLACED ON CLERK'S TICKLER CALENDAR FOR 9/03/13, AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • DECLARATION OF ANDREW P. RUNDQUIST FILED RE: VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • DECLARATION OF ANDREW P. RUNDQUIST FILED RE: REDUCED FILING FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CMPL (CRC 3.740) FILED 08/23/2012 OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE: RED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED; SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less