Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/14/2017 at 21:34:41 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO VS DUGGIN

Case Summary

On 08/23/2012 PORTFOLIO filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DUGGIN. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********5972

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC

Defendant

ROBERT DUGGIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUNDQUIST, ANDREW P

5030 Camino De La Siesta Suite 340

San Diego, CA 92108

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2013
  • CLERK'S TICKLER ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CASE - CHECK FOR FILING OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN 360 DAYS OF FILING COMPLAINT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • CLERK'S TICKLER ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CASE - CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE FILED WITHIN 180 DAYS OF FILING COMPLAINT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2013
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2013
  • CIVIL SAD BEFORE TRIAL - REQ. DISM. - NO ADR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2013
  • ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2012
  • DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 17 TO 09.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2012
  • 5CPFC2 CALENDARED ON 03/06/13 IN DEPT. 17. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 03/06/13 IN DEPT. 09.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2012
  • 5CDJC2 CALENDARED ON 09/03/13 IN DEPT. 17. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 09/03/13 IN DEPT. 09.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2012
  • RETURN OF NON SERVICE FILED ON ROBERT DUGGIN. FEE FOR NON SERVICE IS $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2012
  • RETURN OF NON SERVICE FILED ON ROBERT DUGGIN. FEE FOR NON SERVICE IS $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2012
  • RETURN OF NON SERVICE FILED ON ROBERT DUGGIN. FEE FOR NON SERVICE IS $59.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2012
  • PLACED ON CLERK'S TICKLER CALENDAR FOR 9/03/13, AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2012
  • PLACED ON CLERK'S TICKLER CALENDAR FOR 3/06/13, AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • DECLARATION OF ANDREW P. RUNDQUIST FILED RE: REDUCED FILING FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • DECLARATION OF ANDREW P. RUNDQUIST FILED RE: VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CMPL (CRC 3.740) FILED 08/23/2012 OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE: RED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED; SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less