This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 13:44:10 (UTC).

PORDES VS. SEATON

Case Summary

On 11/29/2016 PORDES filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SEATON. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1794

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MICHAEL PORDES

JUDY PORDES

MALCOLM PORDES

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

MICHAEL SEATON

BAYVIEW BUILDERS, INC

JAMES N SEIBER

RITA P SEIBER

Cross Defendants

ALCAL ROOFING & INSULATION

AIRCO MECHANICAL, INC.

GATOR TECH INTEGRATION, INC.

SURE FIT ROOFING &INSULATION,INC.

PADILLA CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

VALLEY RIVCO, INC.

JAMES M. LOERA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SAFFOURI, HUSSEIN

3736 Mount Diablo Blvd Ste 300

Lafayette, CA 94549

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

HOLLAND, STEVEN N

985 Moraga Rd., Suite 210

Lafayette, CA 94549

Cross Defendant Attorneys

AGAJANIAN, TIM M

1001 Marshall Street Suite 500

Redwood, CA 94063

BLAKE, ALBERT P

P.O. Box 6107

Concord, CA 94520

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2019
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • NOTICE OF/TO CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY PADILLA CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Complete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY GATOR TECH INTEGRATION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY MALCOLM PORDES, JUDY PORDES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Complete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY MICHAEL SEATON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • FIRM/ATTORNEY TIM M AGAJANIAN UPDATED USING FIRM CODE TMA4 TO CORRECT ADDRESS AND PHONE NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • NOTICE OF/TO CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY GATOR TECH INTEGRATION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY MALCOLM PORDES, JUDY PORDES

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2016
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF COMPLAINT FILED 09/15/2016 OF MALCOLM PORDES RE: BUSINESS BAYVIEW BUILDERS, INC W/MAILING ON 09/27/16 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT WAS SET FOR 11/15/16 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/15/2016 OF MALCOLM PORDES FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 2/01/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 11/21/16 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • UPDATED CASE TO CHANGE NAME OF PARTY MALCOLM PORDES

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.