Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/27/2017 at 03:56:50 (UTC).

PITTSBURG VS SWEENY

Case Summary

On 01/22/2013 PITTSBURG filed a Labor - Workplace Harassment lawsuit against SWEENY. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0090

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Workplace Harassment

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Classified By Court

DAVID FOGLEMAN

KAT PARETTE

LYNN FOGLEMAN

STEVE SIMMONS

KEN ESSE

DORIS BEDFORD

DAVID JORDAN

SUSAN BURKITT

CRAIG SCHOENTHALER

RICHARD IRWIN

PITTSBURG YACHT CLUB

GLEN ABRAMS

RICHARD HARDY

KANDI SWEENEY

VICKI SCHOENTHALER

RICHARD CERVANTES

Respondent and Not Classified By Court

RICHARD CERVANTES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: ORDER AFTER HEARING RICHARD CERVANTES 02/12/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2013
  • FILE RETURNED TO COURT RECORDS, MARTINEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2013
  • ORDER AFTER HEARING ON PETITION FOR INJUNCTION PROHIBITING HARASSMENT FILED; PROTECTED PERSON: KAT PARETTE, RICHARD HARDY, RICHARD IRWIN, KANDI SWEENEY, GLEN ABRAMS, KEN ESSE, DORIS BEDFORD, DAVID FOGLEMAN/ ORDER EXPIRES: 02/06/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2013
  • (CIVIL HARASSMENT) PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON CIVIL PETITION FILED 01/22/2013 OF PITTSBURG YACHT CLUB AS TO RICHARD CERVANTES, WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/31/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2013
  • HEARING ON OSC/TRO RE: HARASSMENT (CIVIL) FILED BY PITTSBURG YACHT CLUB; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2013
  • GLEN ABRAMS, KEN ESSE, DORIS BEDFORD, DAVID FOGLEMAN, LYNN FOGLEMAN, CRAIG SCHOENTHALER, VICKI SCHOENTHALER, SUSAN BURKITT, STEVE SIMMONS, DAVID JORDAN ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2013
  • HEARING ON OSC/TRO CIVIL HARASSMENT WAS SET FOR 2/07/13 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. PITT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2013
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2013
  • COLOR OF FILE IS PURPLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2013
  • OSC RE: HARASSMENT AND TRO FILED BY PITTSBURG YACHT CLUB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2013
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. PITT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2013
  • PETITION OF PITTSBURG YACHT CLUB FOR INJUNCTION PROHIBITING HARASSMENT OF EMPLOYEE (WORKPLACE HARASSMENT) FILED

    Read MoreRead Less