Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 07/04/2017 at 15:31:28 (UTC).

PINECREST APTS VS GROVE

Case Summary

On 08/23/2012 PINECREST APTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GROVE. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Concord Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0641

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Concord Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PINECREST APARTMENTS, LLC

Defendants

ROBERT GROVE

ALL OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NAGY, EDWARD A.

510 Third St, Ste 101

Oakland, CA 94607

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2012
  • CLERK`S CALENDAR - FAILURE TO DISPOSITION UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2012
  • RETURNED MAIL: UD NOTICE TO ROBERT GROVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • RETURNED MAIL: UD NOTICE TO ALL OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON ALL OCCUPANTS FOR PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION SERVED ON 08/30/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2012
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 08/23/2012 OF PINECREST APARTMENTS, LLC FILED AS TO DEFENDANT ALL OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2012
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON THE UD COMPLAINT FILED 08/23/2012 OF PINECREST APARTMENTS, LLC AGAINST DEFENDANT ALL OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2012
  • ALL OCCUPANTS ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 08/23/2012 OF PINECREST APARTMENTS, LLC AS TO DEF ENDANT ROBERT GROVE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/30/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2012
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 08/23/2012 OF PINECREST APARTMENTS, LLC FILED AS TO DEFENDANT ROBERT GROVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2012
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON THE UD COMPLAINT FILED 08/23/2012 OF PINECREST APARTMENTS, LLC AGAINST DEFENDANT ROBERT GROVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • HEARING ON FAILURE TO DISPOSITION UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT WAS SET FOR 10/10/12 AT 17:00 IN DEPT. 3CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 08/23/2012 OF PINECREST APARTMENTS, LLC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less