This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 12/18/2021 at 08:56:58 (UTC).

PIEDMONT CAPITAL VS TERRY STEPHENS

Case Summary

On 11/12/2020 PIEDMONT CAPITAL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TERRY STEPHENS. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1919

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

PIEDMONT CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC

193 Blue Ravine Road Ste 260

Folsom, CA 95630

A.B.S LAW GROUP, APROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

ERIC RAY GARDNER

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

TERRY W STEPHENS

San Jose, CA 95112

KIMBERLY STEPHENS

San Jose, CA 95112

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

SHERIDAN, THOMAS B

193 Blue Ravine Road Ste 260

Folsom, CA 95630

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

SCHWINN, FRED W.

1435 Koll Cir. #104

San Jose, CA 95112

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2022
  • HearingDept: 07; Action text: HEARING ON FURTHER CMC & OSC RE: STRIKING DEFTS ANSWERS FOR ( FAILURE TO APPEAR 8/2/21)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketHEARING ON FURTHER CMC & OSC RE: STRIKING DEFTS ANSWERS FOR ( FAILURE TO APPEAR 8/2/21)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketFURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketFILE RETURNED TO COURT RECORDS, MARTINEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketAMENDED ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 11/12/2020 OF TERRY STEPHENS FILED BY PIEDMONT CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketSTIPULATION & ORDER FILED TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FI LE DEMURRER TO ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketFILE RETURNED TO COURT RECORDS, MARTINEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketDEFAULT DEPARTMENT CHANGED TO 07

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketFEE RECEIVED FOR STIPO FROM TERRY W STEPHENS, KIMBERLY STEPHENS

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT, CROSS COMPLAINT MAILED ON 11/10/20 TO SEE SERVICE LSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • Docket(U.J.) CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY TERRY W STEPHENS, KIMBERLY STEPHENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • Docket(U.J.) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 09/23/2020 OF PIEDMONT CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC FILED BY TERRY W STEPHENS, KIMBERLY STEPHENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 12/02/20 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/23/2020 OF PIEDMONT CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 2/10/21 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 12

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABS Law Group is a litigant

Latest cases where Piedmont Capital Management, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Schwinn, Fred W.