Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/28/2019 at 09:09:25 (UTC).

PENAFLOR & HEWLEN VS ROWELL & BLANKENSHIP

Case Summary

On 03/14/2012 PENAFLOR HEWLEN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ROWELL BLANKENSHIP. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Concord Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0205

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Concord Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DUANE HEWLEN

NORA PENAFLOR

Defendants

HEATH BLANKENSHIP

Concord, CA 94521

ALL OCCUPANTS

STEPHANIE ROWELL

Concord, CA 94521

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LERNER, CAROL L

961 Ygnacio Valley Road

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2012
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) RETURNED WHOLLY UN-SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2012
  • CLERK`S CALENDAR - FAILURE TO DISPOSITION UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2012
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2012
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED - CONTESTED COURT TRIAL ON 04/10/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2012
  • JUDGMENT AFTER COURT TRIAL SUBMITTED TO COMMISSIONER CREIGHTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • COURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL WAS SET FOR 4/10/12 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. 54

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2012
  • TRIAL NOTICES ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON ALL OCCUPANTS FOR PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION SERVED ON 03/19/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2012
  • MEMO TO SET COURT TRIAL FILED BY NORA PENAFLOR

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2012
  • ANSWER TO UD COMPLAINT FILED 03/14/2012 OF NORA PENAFLOR FILED BY STEPHANIE ROWELL, HEATH BLANKENSHIP. ATTORNEY PRO/PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2012
  • ORDER TO POST SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2012
  • POSTING ORDER SUBMITTED TO COMMISSIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2012
  • APPLICATION/DECLARATION FOR ORDER TO POST SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2012
  • HEARING ON FAILURE TO DISPOSITION UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT WAS SET FOR 5/02/12 AT 17:00 IN DEPT. 3CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 03/14/2012 OF NORA PENAFLOR FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LERNER, CAROL L.