This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 05/29/2017 at 12:09:05 (UTC).

PATRICIA COLMENARES VS RAMO'N PEREZ

Case Summary

On 03/10/2017 PATRICIA COLMENARES filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against RAMO'N PEREZ. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1234

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PATRICIA DE LA CRUZ COLMENARES

Pittsburg, CA 94565

Respondent

RAMO'N DE LA CRUZ PEREZ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2017
  • FINDINGS & ORDER AFTER 050217 HEARING RE: CUSTODY AND VISITATION, PROPERTY ORDERS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • (F/L) PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON DISSOLUTION WITH CHILDREN FILED 03/10/2017 OF PATRICIA COLMENARES AS TO RAMO'N DE LA CRUZ PEREZ (SERVED ON 04/04/17)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • HRG ON F/L MTN/OSC TO/FOR CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION (OST/TEMP-G) ( PATRICIA DE LA CRUZ COLMENARES)(PRO PER); Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • F/L APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR REISSUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY PATRICIA DE LA CRUZ COLMENARES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • HRG ON F/L MTN/OSC TO/FOR CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION (OST/TEMP-G) ( PATRICIA DE LA CRUZ COLMENARES)(PRO PER); Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • HEARING ON MOTION/OSC WAS SET FOR 4/04/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • FAMILY LAW REQUEST FOR ORDERS RE: CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION (OST/TEMP-G), FILED BY: PATRICIA DE LA CRUZ COLMENARES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • FAMILY LAW EXPARTE RE: CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION (OST/TEMP-G) FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS WAS SET FOR 3/09/22 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2017
  • (FAMILY LAW) SUMMONS ON DISSOLUTION WITH CHILDREN FILED 03/10/2017 OF PATRICIA COLMENARES FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY PATRICIA DE LA CRUZ COLMENARES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY PATRICIA DE LA CRUZ COLMENARES (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO PATRICIA DE LA CRUZ COLMENARES IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 6/08/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 9/06/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 3/12/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 9/06/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.