This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 13:02:21 (UTC).

PANIS VS PULTE HOME

Case Summary

On 08/23/2017 PANIS filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against PULTE HOME. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0610

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MONIQUE RALPH

ROVELYN HATHAWAY

JOHN PANIS

JOHN HATHAWAY

CLAIRMONT RALPH

CUONG NGUYEN

KRISTEN FRANCISCO

CHARLOTTE DIMING

PHAN HUYEN

JILL ALIPIO-PANIS

JANELLE FRANCISCO (BONACUA)

KATHLEEN M GALLEGOS

ROBERT & KATHRYN SEERS LIVING TRUST

ROWELL S TORRES

Defendants

PULTE HOME CORP

DAGGETT ELECTRIC

MONSCHEIN INDUSTRIES, INC.

ANTIOCH PLUBMING, INC.

CEDAR VALLEY CONCRETE

WESTERN INSULATION, LP

57 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHODZKO, MEGAN M.

1650 Hotel Circle North Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92108

Defendant Attorney

PHILLIPS, KORY L.

5860 Owens Drive Ste 410

Pleasanton, CA 94588

Other Attorneys

PETERSON, PATRICIA J

P.O.Box 64093

St.Paul, MN 94598

WELCH, STEPHEN B

333 Bush Street Suite 1100

San Francisco, CA 94104

LEVY, DAVID M

1600 South Main Plaza Suite 325

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

KIRKPATRICK, CHERYL A.

3 Park Plaza Suite 350

Irvine, CA 92614

LETOFSKY, LARRY D

3655 Nobel Drive Suite 400

San Diego, CA 92122

STONE, ESQ., COLETTE F.

2125 Ygnacio Valley Road Suite 101

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

HENDERSON, LEANNA L.

701 University Ave. Suite 100

Sacramento, CA 95825

MILIONIS, GEORGE K

39300 Civic Center Drive Suite 300

Fremont, CA 94538

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2018
  • DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 17 TO 39.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER SEE SERVICE LIST 10/30/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • NOTICE OF/TO ENTRY OF ORDER FILED BY JOHN PANIS, JILL ALIPIO-PANIS, CHARLOTTE DIMING, KRISTEN FRANCISCO, JANELLE FRANCISCO (BONACUA), KATHLEEN M GALLEGOS, CUONG NGUYEN, PHAN HUYEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE CONSOLIDATED PER ORDER FILED 10-3-17 IN MASTER CASE MSC16-01712/THIS IS SUBORDINATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • ** VOID ** RESPONSE COMPLEX LIT FEE GC70616(B)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • ** VOID ** CIVIL 1ST PAPER - OTHER PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/19/2017 OF PULTE HOME COMPANY,LLC AS TO J. EDWARD GISH, INC. WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/02/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/19/2017 OF PULTE HOME COMPANY,LLC AS TO PINNACLE STAIR GROUP WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/14/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF COMPLAINT FILED 06/19/2017 OF PULTE HOME COMPANY,LLC AS TO EBM CONSTRUCTION, INC. WITH DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE AND DECLARATION OF MAILING ON 09/29/17 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
111 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2017
  • ADVANCED NON-REFUNDABLE JURY FEE PAID BY: ONE HOUR DELIVERY SVC, ON BEHALF OF PARTY: JOHN PANIS, JILL ALIPIO-PANIS, CHARLOTTE DIMING, KRISTEN FRANCISCO, JANELLE FRANCISCO (BONACUA), KATHLEEN M GALLEGOS, JOHN HATHAWAY, ROVELYN HATHAWAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • EPIFANIO CUENCA, ESGRENE CUENCA, NAVEED LUTFI, ROBERT SEERS, KATHRYN SEERS, ROBERT & KATHRYN SEERS LIVING TRUST, ROWELL S TORRES, PATRICIA P TORRES ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • (U.J.) AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 04/04/2017 OF JOHN PANIS RE: NAMING ADDITIONAL HOMEOWNERS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/04/2017 OF JOHN PANIS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • COLOR OF FILE IS PINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • COMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION FEE ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/04/2017 OF JOHN PANIS PAID BY ONE HOUR DELIVERY SERVICE (PLAINTIFF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 6/07/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cedar Valley Concrete Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Western Insulation LP is a litigant

Latest cases where Pulte Home Company, LLC, successor by conversion of Pulte Home Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Monschein Industries, Inc. is a litigant