This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 07/11/2021 at 22:30:05 (UTC).

PAMATTO AND WOODARD VS PACIFIC SERVICE CREDIT UNIO

Case Summary

On 05/09/2016 PAMATTO AND WOODARD filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against PACIFIC SERVICE CREDIT UNIO. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0901

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KIM PAMATTO

TIFFANY WOODARD

Defendant

PACIFIC SERVICE CREDIT UNION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORGAN, RHONDA L

31630 Railroad Canyon Rd. Suite 10

Canyon Lake, CA 92587

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2016
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • DocketCHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • DocketREQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • DocketCHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • DocketCHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT; Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/09/2016 OF KIM PAMATTO AS TO PACIFIC SERVICE CREDIT UNION WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/18/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • DocketCLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT WAS SET FOR 7/05/16 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • DocketCASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/09/2016 OF KIM PAMATTO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE IS PINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 9/26/16 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • DocketCLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 7/13/16 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • DocketCASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFIC SERVICE CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORGAN RHONDA L. ESQ.