This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 07/18/2017 at 10:28:59 (UTC).

PAGE VS. LAWSON

Case Summary

On 06/22/2016 PAGE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LAWSON. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0421

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARQUITA PAGE

Pittsburg, CA 94565

Defendants

ANNTIONETTE LAWSON

Pittsburg, CA 94565

REGINIA LAWSON

Pittsburg, CA 94565

WILLIE LAWSON

Pittsburg, CA 94565

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2017
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 06/22/2016 OF MARQUITA PAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • THE COURT NOW RULES ON THE MOTION TO VACATE HEARD ON 09/30/16. THE MOTION IS DENIED. YOU HAVE 10 DAYS FROM THE MAILING OF THIS NOTICE TO FILE AN APPEAL OF THE DENIAL OF THE MOTION TO VACATE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • THE COURT NOW RULES ON THE MOTION TO VACATE HEARD ON 09/30/16. THE MOTION IS DENIED. YOU HAVE 10 DAYS FROM THE MAILING OF THIS NOTICE TO FILE AN APPEAL OF THE DENIAL OF THE MOTION TO VACATE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • SC MTN/HRG TO VACATE JUDGMENT AGAINST REGINA LAWSON FILED BY REGINIA LAWSON; Disposition: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • SC MTN/HRG TO SMALL CLAIMS MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT FILED BY ANNTIONETTE LAWSON; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF NOTICE OF MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT SENT TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS MOTION/HEARING WAS SET FOR 9/30/16 AT 8:45 IN DEPT. 57

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY ANNTIONETTE LAWSON (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO ANNTIONETTE LAWSON IS GRANTED; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS MOTION TO VACATE FILED BY ANNTIONETTE LAWSON

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 06/22/2016 OF MARQUITA PAGE AS TO DEFENDANT REGINIA LAWSON FILED. DATE OF SERVICE 07/08/16. FEE FOR SERVICE $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 06/22/2016 OF MARQUITA PAGE AS TO DEFENDANT WILLIE LAWSON FILED. DATE OF SERVICE 07/24/16. FEE FOR SERVICE $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • A SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL WAS SET FOR 8/01/16 AT 8:45 IN DEPT. 57

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY MARQUITA PAGE (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO MARQUITA PAGE IS GRANTED; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FOR PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM GREATER THAN $5,000.00, UP TO $10,000.00 - BY NATURAL PERSONS ONLY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM: $10,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less