This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 11/25/2023 at 06:38:22 (UTC).

Pacific Bell Telephone Company VS. County of Contra Costa

Case Summary

On 03/17/2023 Pacific Bell Telephone Company filed an Other lawsuit against County of Contra Costa. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Douglas, Danielle K. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0611

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

Judge Details

Judge

Douglas, Danielle K

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

Pacific Bell Telephone Company

Level 3 Communications LLC

Sprint Communications Company, L.P.

Sprint Spectrum, L.P.

Sprint Telephony PCS, L.P.

T-Mobile West LLC

CenturyLink Communications LLC

AT&T Mobility LLC

AT&T Corp.

Defendants and Respondents

County of Contra Costa

The State Board of Equalization

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

BRONSHTEYN, GABRIEL

 

Court Documents

Contra Costa Cover Sheet

03/17/2023: Contra Costa Cover Sheet

Complaint

03/17/2023: Complaint

CMC Notice - Fast Track

08/08/2023: CMC Notice - Fast Track

Summons Issued/Filed

03/30/2023: Summons Issued/Filed

Notice of/to: Deadline to Serve Complaint

04/03/2023: Notice of/to: Deadline to Serve Complaint

Lodge Order/Judgment

04/03/2023: Lodge Order/Judgment

Order Filed Re:

04/18/2023: Order Filed Re:

Substitution of Attorney as to AT&T Corp

09/12/2023: Substitution of Attorney as to AT&T Corp

Substitution of Attorney Filed re: AT&T MOBILITY LLC

09/12/2023: Substitution of Attorney Filed re: AT&T MOBILITY LLC

Substitution of Attorney as to T-MOBILE WEST LLC

09/12/2023: Substitution of Attorney as to T-MOBILE WEST LLC

Substitution of Attorney Filed re: SPRINT SPECTRUM, L.P.

09/12/2023: Substitution of Attorney Filed re: SPRINT SPECTRUM, L.P.

Substitution of Attorney as to SPRINT TELEPHONY PCS, LP

09/12/2023: Substitution of Attorney as to SPRINT TELEPHONY PCS, LP

Substitution of Attorney Filed re: SPRINT COMMUNICATIONS COMPANY, L.P.

09/12/2023: Substitution of Attorney Filed re: SPRINT COMMUNICATIONS COMPANY, L.P.

Substitution of Attorney as to LEVEL 3 COMMUNICATIONS, LLC

09/12/2023: Substitution of Attorney as to LEVEL 3 COMMUNICATIONS, LLC

Substitution of Attorney Filed as to PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE CO.

09/12/2023: Substitution of Attorney Filed as to PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE CO.

Substitution of Attorney as to CENTURYLINK COMMUNICATIONS LLC

09/12/2023: Substitution of Attorney as to CENTURYLINK COMMUNICATIONS LLC

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/18/2024
View Court Documents

Docket*Case Management Conference; CMC Notice - Fast Track; Judicial Officer: Douglas, Danielle K; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed; Substitution of Attorney as to CENTURYLINK COMMUNICATIONS LLC; Comment: Substitution of Attorney as to CENTURYLINK COMMUNICATIONS LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed; Substitution of Attorney Filed as to PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE CO.; Comment: Substitution of Attorney Filed as to PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE CO.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed; Substitution of Attorney as to LEVEL 3 COMMUNICATIONS, LLC; Comment: Substitution of Attorney as to LEVEL 3 COMMUNICATIONS, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed; Substitution of Attorney Filed re: SPRINT COMMUNICATIONS COMPANY, L.P.; Comment: Substitution of Attorney Filed as to SPRINT COMMUNICATIONS COMPANY, L.P.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed; Substitution of Attorney as to SPRINT TELEPHONY PCS, LP; Comment: Substitution of Attorney as to SPRINT TELEPHONY PCS, LP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed; Substitution of Attorney Filed re: SPRINT SPECTRUM, L.P.; Comment: Substitution of Attorney Filed as to SPRINT SPECTRUM, L.P.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed; Substitution of Attorney as to T-MOBILE WEST LLC; Comment: Substitution of Attorney as to T-MOBILE WEST LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed; Substitution of Attorney Filed re: AT&T MOBILITY LLC; Comment: Substitution of Attorney Filed as to AT&T MOBILITY LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed; Substitution of Attorney as to AT&T Corp; Comment: Substitution of Attorney as to AT&T Corp

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketOrder Filed Re:; Comment: CONT CASE DEADLINES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2023

DocketNotes; Comment: signed order to 103

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketLodge Order/Judgment; Comment: [Proposed} Order Continuing Case Deadlines

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of/to:; Notice of/to: Deadline to Serve Complaint; Comment: Deadline to Serve Complaint Under Revenue and Taxation Code Section 5147 and Request to Continue

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued/Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2023

DocketService of Complaint and Summons; Requested By: Pacific Bell Telephone Company, Level 3 Communications LLC, Sprint Communications Company, L.P., Sprint Spectrum, L.P., Sprint Telephony PCS, L.P., T-Mobile West LLC, CenturyLink Communications LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Corp.; Unserved; Unserved

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketInitial Complaint Filed; Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Contra Costa Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2023

DocketFee Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less