This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/14/2017 at 16:44:50 (UTC).

PACE VS PITTSBURG

Case Summary

On 08/14/2012 PACE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PITTSBURG. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********5410

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PACE SUPPLY CORP.

Defendants

PITTSBURG UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

ROEBBELEN CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT SERVICES,

S.J. AMOROSO CONSTRUCTION CO.,INC.

RONALD VINCENT

FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANYOF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HATCHER JR, WILLIAM W

114 Pierce St

Santa Rosa, CA 95404

Defendant Attorneys

WILLIAMS, MARK

70 Washington Street Suite 205

Oakland, CA 94607-3795

THOMPSON, SEAN

500 Capitol Mall Suite 1500

Sacramento, CA 95814

ASHBY, DAVID L

777 Cuesta Dr. Suite 200

Mountain View, CA 94040

COREY, DANA R

983 University Avenue #104C

Los Gatos, CA 95032

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2014
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2013
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • CIVIL SAD BEFORE TRIAL - INTRACOUNTY TRANSFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • CASE IS CLOSED - NO FURTHER ACTION TO BE TAKEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASES INTO JCCP MS4706 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2012
  • UPDATE TRACK ASSIGNMENT TO ELECRONIC FAST TRACK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2012
  • DEFAULT DEPARTMENT CHANGED TO 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY PITTSBURG UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY RONALD VINCENT

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 08/30/2012
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 08/14/2012 OF PACE SUPPLY CORP. AS TO PITTSBURG UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/27/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2012
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT WAS SET FOR 10/15/12 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2012
  • WE CANNOT FILE/ISSUE YOUR PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 1/08/13 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 10/18/12 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 08/14/2012 OF PACE SUPPLY CORP. FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GREEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED; SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 06

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROEBBELEN CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where PITTSBURG UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where S.J. AMOROSO CONSTRUCTION CO., INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Safeco Insurance Company of America is a litigant