Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 05/31/2017 at 04:09:41 (UTC).

ORTIZ VS GRABBER CONSTRUCTION

Case Summary

On 05/25/2012 ORTIZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against GRABBER CONSTRUCTION. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1282

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIGUEL ORTIZ

Defendants

ERIC LAMAR JONES

GRABBER CONSTRUCTION PRODUCTS,INC.

Other

DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT

Not Classified By Court

CASE MEDIATOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VENARDI, MARK L

700 Ygnacio Valley Road Suite 300

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Defendant Attorneys

BRUNO, MICHAEL D.

275 Battery Street Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

BLACKBURN, STEVEN R

655 Montgomery St. Suite 1150

San Francisco, CA 94111

Other Attorney

MADRIGAL, TRINIDAD

Dept Of Child Support Attorney 555 County Center

Redwood City, CA 94063

Not Classified By Court Attorney

FLIER (RET), HON. RICHARD S.

100 1St Street 27Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2014
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2014
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • CHECK FOR DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2014
  • CORRESPONDENCE MEMO RE: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 06 TO 34.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • CORRESPONDENCE MEMO RE: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2014
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • NOTICE OF/TO UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED BY MIGUEL ORTIZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • CLERK`S TICKLER WAS SET FOR 3/03/14 AT 7:00 IN DEPT 34

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2013
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2012
  • NOTICE OF/TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOCAL TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY GRABBER CONSTRUCTION PRODUCTS,INC., ERIC LAMAR JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2012
  • (U.J.) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 05/25/2012 OF MIGUEL ORTIZ FILED BY GRABBER CONSTRUCTION PRODUCTS,INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • (U.J.)NOTICE OF LIEN CLAIMANT FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF CHILDSUPPORT; REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF ALL COURT PROCEEDINGS TO BE SENT TO LIEN CLAIMANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/25/2012 OF MIGUEL ORTIZ FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS RED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 10/18/12 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2012
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 7/30/12 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2012
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer VENARDI, MARK L.