This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 11:48:21 (UTC).

ORTIZ VS AMAZOM.COM

Case Summary

On 06/02/2017 ORTIZ filed an Other lawsuit against AMAZOM COM. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1045

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MICHAEL ORTIZ

Defendants

GOLDEN STATE FC LLC,

AMAZON.COM, LLC,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLE, SCOTT EDWARD

1970 Broadway Ninth Floor

Oakland, CA 94612

Defendant Attorney

MECKLEY, ERIC

One Market, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2018
  • DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 09 TO 21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • CASE REMOVED FROM COURT`S CONTROL DUE TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL HAVING BEEN FILED/ENTERED INTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF CASE TO US DISTRICT COURT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • (U.J.) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 06/02/2017 OF MICHAEL ORTIZ FILED BY AMAZON.COM, LLC,, GOLDEN STATE FC LLC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/02/2017 OF MICHAEL ORTIZ AS TO GOLDEN STATE FC LLC, WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/05/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT WAS SET FOR 7/21/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/02/2017 OF MICHAEL ORTIZ AS TO AMAZON.COM, LLC, WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/05/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/02/2017 OF MICHAEL ORTIZ FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • COLOR OF FILE IS YELLOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 10/20/17 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 8/07/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.