This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 10/27/2022 at 09:41:21 (UTC).

ORLANDO GONZALES vs. ZBS LAW, LLP, a Limited Liability Partnership

Case Summary

On 05/17/2022 ORLANDO GONZALES filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ZBS LAW, LLP, a Limited Liability Partnership. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fannin, Jill C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1013

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fannin, Jill C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GONZALES, ORLANDO

Defendants and Respondents

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB

ZBS LAW, LLP, a Limited Liability Partnership

CHRISTIANA TRUST AS TRUSTEE FOR PNPMS TRUST 1C/O STATEBRIDGE COMPANY, LLC

DOES 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MCFARLIN, TIMOTHY G

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

Cole, Ralph V

 

Court Documents

Initial Complaint Filed

05/17/2022: Initial Complaint Filed

Summons Issued/Filed

05/17/2022: Summons Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/17/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service of Summons

05/27/2022: Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons

06/01/2022: Proof of Service of Summons

Declaration Re:

06/06/2022: Declaration Re:

Wilmington Savings Fund Answer to Complaint

06/24/2022: Wilmington Savings Fund Answer to Complaint

Case Management Conference Statement Filed

09/12/2022: Case Management Conference Statement Filed

CMC Notice - Fast Track

09/27/2022: CMC Notice - Fast Track

Minutes

09/27/2022: Minutes

Notice of/to: Ruling at Case Management Conference Notice of Hearing on Order to Show Cause

09/28/2022: Notice of/to: Ruling at Case Management Conference Notice of Hearing on Order to Show Cause

Hearing on Order to Show Cause in Re:

01/30/2023: Hearing on Order to Show Cause in Re:

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing on Order to Show Cause in Re:; Judicial Officer: Fannin, Jill C; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: WHY THE CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO APPEAR AT 09/27/22 CMC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of/to:; Notice of/to: Ruling at Case Management Conference Notice of Hearing on Order to Show Cause; Comment: Ruling at Case Management Conference Notice of Hearing on Order to Show Cause

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket*Case Management Conference; CMC Notice - Fast Track; Minutes; Judicial Officer: Fannin, Jill C; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Statement Filed; Comment: Case Management Conference Statement Filed by Defendant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer/Response/Denial - Unlimited; Wilmington Savings Fund Answer to Complaint; Comment: of Wilmington Savings Fund to Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Re:; Comment: NONMONETARY STATUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Comment: PERSONAL SVC ON 5-27-22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Comment: Sub served & mailed on 05/20/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • Cause Of ActionComplaint; Type: Action; Description: 05/17/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Complaint; File Date: 05/17/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketService of Complaint and Summons; Requested By: GONZALES, ORLANDO; Served: 05/20/2022; Served: 05/27/2022; Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketFee Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued/Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Complaint Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ZBS LAW LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where Christiana Trust, not in its Individual Capacity is a litigant

Latest cases where Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCFARLIN TIMOTHY G.