This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 07/31/2017 at 11:42:58 (UTC).

OMEGA METALS VS HAPAG-LLOYD

Case Summary

On 10/11/2012 OMEGA METALS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HAPAG-LLOYD. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Walnut Creek Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0352

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Walnut Creek Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

OMEGA METALS COMPANY, INC.

1327 North Main St. #100

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Defendant and Appellant

HAPAG-LLOYD (AMERICA) INC.

818 West Seventh Street Aos: Ct Corporation System

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2013
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2012
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED/ENTERED ON APPEAL JUDGMENT FILED 10/11/2012 OF HAPAG-LLOYD (AMERICA) INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2012
  • SET JUDGMENT STATUS 0002 SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2012
  • TRIAL DE NOVO ON SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • ABANDONMENT OF APPEAL FILED BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2012
  • TRIAL DE NOVO ON SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL; Disposition: NOT HEARD-CONT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2012
  • CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE SENT TO THE FOLLOWING PARTIES:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2012
  • ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2012
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FILED BY HAPAG-LLOYD (AMERICA) INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2012
  • HEARING ON APPEAL OF SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL DE NOVO WAS SET FOR 11/02/12 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. SCA.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Disposition: NOT HEARD-CONT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • RE: CHANGE IN HEARING DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL FILED ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 05/15/2012 OF OMEGA METALS COMPANY, INC. AS TO DEFENDANT HAPAG-LLOYD (AMERICA) INC. WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 05/21/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 7/11/12 AT 10:30 IN DEPT. 59

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2012
  • CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER SENT TO THE FOLLOWING PARTIES:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GRAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2012
  • COPY OF SMALL CLAIMS CLAIM AND ORDER ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 05/15/2012 OF OMEGA METALS COMPANY, INC. SENT CERTIFIED MAIL BY CLERK THIS DATE TO: HAPAG-LLOYD (AMERICA) INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2012
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM GREATER THAN $1,500.00, UP TO $5,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2012
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM: $4,801.93

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.