This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/16/2017 at 17:28:06 (UTC).

OLSON VS. ALLSTATE

Case Summary

On 03/14/2014 OLSON filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ALLSTATE. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0513

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OLSON 737-RICHMOND132, LLC

Defendants

ALLSTATE CONTRACT FLOORS, INC.

BASCO DRYWALL & PAINTING CO.

WORTHEN ENTERPRISES, INC

COAST INSULATION CONTRACTORS, INC.

GONSALVES & SANTUCCI, INC.

COUNTRY BUILDERS, INC.

DAWSON ELECTRIC

DIVISION TWO CONSTRUCTION, INC.

EBM CONSTRUCTION, INC.

ELLIOTT AND ELLIOTT CO.

GHILOTTI BROS., INC.

OLSON AND CO STEEL

THE PENINSULA GROUP, INC

WESTERN BUILDING SPECIALTIES OF SACRAMENTO

WESTERN SHOWER DOOR, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARTZ, NICOLE E.

1851 East First Street 10Th Floor

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Defendant Attorneys

MCCARTHY, KEVIN P

492 Ninth Street Suite 220

Oakland, CA 94607

HAMMONS, WALLACE W

2601 Airport Drive, Suite 105

Torrance, CA 90505

RUTHERFORD, LUANNE

1211 Newell Avenue

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2015
  • CHECK FOR DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • REQUEST FILED & DISMISSAL ENTERED COMPLAINT FILED 03/14/2014 OF OLSON 737-RICHMOND132, LLC AS TO DEFENDANT BASCO DRYWALL & PAINTING CO., COAST INSULATION CONTRACTORS, INC. WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2015
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY BASCO DRYWALL & PAINTING CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY OLSON 737-RICHMOND132, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • NOTICE OF/TO CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY OLSON 737-RICHMOND132, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Complete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY BASCO DRYWALL & PAINTING CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • REQUEST FILED & DISMISSAL ENTERED COMPLAINT FILED 03/14/2014 OF OLSON 737-RICHMOND132, LLC AS TO DEFENDANT ELLIOTT AND ELLIOTTCO. WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY OLSON 737-RICHMOND132, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2014
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/14/2014 OF OLSON 737-RICHMOND132, LLC AS TO COAST INSULATION CONTRACTORS, INC. WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/02/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 03/14/2014 OF OLSON 737-RICHMOND132, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • AMENDED SUMMONS FILED BY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 5/14/14 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 4/28/14 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/14/2014 OF OLSON 737-RICHMOND132, LLC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GRAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.