This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/29/2019 at 19:52:10 (UTC).

O'HANKS MANAGEMENT VS. SARAI

Case Summary

On 09/24/2014 O'HANKS MANAGEMENT filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SARAI. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0979

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

O'HANKS MANAGEMENT, INC.

Defendants

PATRICIA SARAI

Rodeo, CA 94805

RICHARD RANDLE SCHAFER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALEXANDER, RICHARD J

201 West Richmond Ave., Ste 3

Richmond, CA 94801

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/24/2014
  • DocketRETURNED WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY RETURNED FULLY SATISFIED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2014
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINERS NOT DISPOSITIONED OR IN THE COURT CONTROL WITH IN 45 DAYS; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2014
  • DocketCLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF JUDGMENT SENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2014
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED - UNCONTESTED COURT TRIAL ON 10/30/14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2014
  • DocketCOURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • DocketCOURT TRIAL - U.D. WAS SET FOR 10/30/14 AT 13:15 IN DEPT. 57

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • DocketMEMORANDUM TO SET CASE FOR COURT TRIAL FILED BY O'HANKS MANAGEMENT,INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • DocketREQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 09/24/2014 OF O'HANKS MANAGEMENT,INC. FILED AS TO DEFENDANT RICHARD RANDLE SCHAFER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED ON THE UD COMPLAINT FILED 09/24/2014 OF O'HANKS MANAGEMENT,INC. AGAINST DEFENDANT RICHARD RANDLE SCHAFER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 09/24/2014 OF O'HANKS MANAGEMENT,INC. AS TO DEF ENDANT RICHARD RANDLE SCHAFER WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/25/14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY PATRICIA SARAI (CONFIDENTIAL)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO PATRICIA SARAI IS GRANTED; Disposition: Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • DocketANSWER TO UD COMPLAINT FILED 09/24/2014 OF O'HANKS MANAGEMENT,INC. FILED BY PATRICIA SARAI REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • DocketHEARING SET FOR DISPOSITION DATE ON 11/08/14 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 2CLK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 09/24/2014 OF O'HANKS MANAGEMENT,INC. FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE IS LAVENDAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALEXANDER, RICHARD J.