This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/24/2019 at 11:11:57 (UTC).

ODELL VS WELLS FARGO

Case Summary

On 05/15/2009 ODELL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WELLS FARGO. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Walnut Creek Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0369

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ERIKA P. ODELL

Orinda, CA 94563

Defendant

WELLS FARGO BANK

3 Carolyn Ct

Orinda, CA 94563

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2016
  • DocketCLERKS NOTICE OF INTENT TO DESTROY EXHIBITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2009
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 07/15/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2009
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT WAS MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 07/15/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2009
  • DocketCAUSE HAVING BEEN CALLED FOR HEARING/TRIAL ON 06/24/09 THE COURT NOW MAKES THE FOLLOWING RULING:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2009
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 06/24/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2009
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2009
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL FILED ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 05/15/2009 OF ERIKA ODELL AS TO DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 05/16/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2009
  • DocketCLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM SENT TO THE FOLLOWING PARTIES:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2009
  • DocketCASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2009
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE IS MANILA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2009
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 6/24/09 AT 10:30 IN DEPT. 59

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2009
  • DocketCOPY OF SMALL CLAIMS CLAIM AND ORDER ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 05/15/2009 OF ERIKA ODELL SENT CERTIFIED MAIL BY CLERK THIS DATE TO: WELLS FARGO BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2009
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM UP TO $1,500.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2009
  • DocketAMOUNT OF CLAIM: $350.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant