This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/27/2019 at 02:53:50 (UTC).

NUNES VS ALSAHUDDIN

Case Summary

On 05/15/2017 NUNES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ALSAHUDDIN. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0495

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MANUEL J NUNES

Oakley, CA 94561

Defendants

ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

MANSOUR ALSALAHUDDIN

Oakley, CA 94561

FAYE ALSALAHUDDIN

Oakley, CA 94561

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) RETURNED FULLY SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • FAILURE TO DISPOSITION UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE OVER 45 DAYS FROM FILING DATE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF ORDER DENYING STAY OF EXECUTION SENT TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • ORDER TO/FOR EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR STAY OF JUDGMENT-DENIAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • HEARING ON MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT; Disposition: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • PETITION FOR STAY OF EXECUTION FILED BY FAYE ALSALAHUDDIN, MANSOUR ALSALAHUDDIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • A LAW & MOTION HEARING WAS SET FOR 6/27/17 AT 8:45 IN DEPT. 57

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • MOTION TO/FOR VACATE JUDGEMENT FILED BY FAYE ALSALAHUDDIN, MANSOUR ALSALAHUDDIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2017
  • COURT REPORTER IS NOT REQUESTED BY MANUEL J NUNES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • UD TRIAL SET FOR 6/06/17 AT 8:45 IN DEPT. 57

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO FAYE ALSALAHUDDIN, MANSOUR ALSALAHUDDIN IS GRANTED; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY FAYE ALSALAHUDDIN, MANSOUR ALSALAHUDDIN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • ANSWER TO UD COMPLAINT FILED 05/15/2017 OF MANUEL NUNES FILED BY FAYE ALSALAHUDDIN, MANSOUR ALSALAHUDDIN REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER OVER 45 DAYS WAS SET FOR 6/29/17 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. 4CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 05/15/2017 OF MANUEL NUNES FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • COLOR OF FILE IS YELLOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.