Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/24/2019 at 22:27:35 (UTC).

NOZ VS WOLF

Case Summary

On 07/11/2012 NOZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WOLF. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Walnut Creek Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0490

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Walnut Creek Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAPHAEL VINCENT NOZ

San Francisco, CA 94114

Defendant

HELENA WOLF

San Francisco, CA 94114

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2013
  • EXHIBITS DESTROYED PURSUANT TO CCP 1952-1952.3 AFTER PROPER NOTICE TO THE PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 09/20/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2012
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT WAS MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 09/20/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2012
  • CAUSE HAVING BEEN CALLED FOR HEARING/TRIAL ON 08/30/12 THE COURT NOW MAKES THE FOLLOWING RULING:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 08/30/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 07/11/2012 OF RAPHAEL NOZ AS TO DEFENDANT HELENA WOLF FILED. DATE OF SERVICE 07/15/12. FEE FOR SERVICE $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2012
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY RAPHAEL VINCENT NOZ (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2012
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO RAPHAEL VINCENT NOZ IS GRANTED; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 8/30/12 AT 10:30 IN DEPT. 59

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2012
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM UP TO $1,500.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2012
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM: $1,295.00

    Read MoreRead Less