Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 05/30/2017 at 16:26:45 (UTC).

NICHOLAS GUMS VS. WILLIAM LYON HOMES, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/15/2012 NICHOLAS GUMS filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against WILLIAM LYON HOMES, INC. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0652

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALMA QUINTANILLA

CAROLYN FEREIRA

NICHOLAS GUMS

REYNOLDO CUEVAS

WILLIAM PRATHER

DANIEL SCHRAGER

KASSAYE SABIR

REYNALDO CUEVAS

REINA AGUILAR-ORTEGA

MARTA AHMED

RODNEY HOWARD

ANITA PRATHER

ERIC SHARYER

BERNADETTE FRENCH

ANA BARAHONA

Defendants

ACE LATH & PLASTER, INC.

HOMESITE SERVICES,INC.

COASTAL CONSTRUCTION & LUMBER CO.

INSIGHT GLASS, INC.

ELLISON FRAMING, INC.

24 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMSON, SCOTT J

1990 N. California Boulevard Suite 1060

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Other Attorneys

O'CONNELL, DANIEL M

1333 N. California Blvd Suite 600

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

MORROW, J BRIAN

1333 N California Blvd Suite 600

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2014
  • DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 09 TO 17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2013
  • CHECK FOR DISMISSALS; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO PLAINTIFF MA C MERCADER, MICHAEL MERCADER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • DISMISSAL OF JEFF MORRIS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • DISMISSAL FILED/ENTERED ON THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2013
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2013
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2013
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY WILLIAM LYON HOMES,INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
89 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2012
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF COMPLAINT FILED 03/15/2012 OF NICHOLAS GUMS RE: BUSINESS WILLIAM LYON HOMES,INC. W/MAILING ON 03/21/12 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2012
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT WAS SET FOR 5/04/12 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2012
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO PLAINTIFF JOSE BARAHONA, ANA BARAHONA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 5/15/12 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/15/2012 OF NICHOLAS GUMS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS YELLOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2012
  • COMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION FEE ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/15/2012 OF NICHOLAS GUMS PAID BY ONE LEGAL, LLC OBO PLAINTIFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2012
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ELLISON FRAMING, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Insight Glass, a California corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where COASTAL CONSTRUCTION & LUMBER COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Homesite Services, Inc. is a litigant