This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 at 15:08:27 (UTC).

NG VS ZUKAUCKAS/ MYERS/ BENNET

Case Summary

On 08/18/2017 NG filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ZUKAUCKAS/ MYERS/ BENNET. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0929

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STANLEY NG

Defendants

ROBIN MYERS

TERESA BENNET

DONNA ZUKAUCKAS

LAMAR MYERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHNIBBEN, ALLEN RAY

605 Eaker Way

Antioch, CA 94509

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) RETURNED FULLY SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • FAILURE TO DISPOSITION UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE OVER 45 DAYS FROM FILING DATE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • PAPERS MAILED TO SUBMITTING PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • PAPERS MAILED TO SUBMITTING PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED - BEFORE TRIAL ON 09/07/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED - BEFORE TRIAL ON 09/07/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • DECLARATION 585D CCP FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • REQUEST FILED & DISMISSAL ENTERED WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 08/18/2017 OF STANLEY NG AS TO DEFENDANT TERESA BENNET ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 08/18/2017 OF STANLEY NG FILED AS TO DEFENDANT DONNA ZUKAUCKAS, ROBIN MYERS, LAMAR MYERS

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 08/18/2017 OF STANLEY NG AS TO DEFENDANT DONNA ZUKAUCKAS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/19/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 08/18/2017 OF STANLEY NG AS TO DEFENDANT ROBIN MYERS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/19/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 08/18/2017 OF STANLEY NG AS TO DEFENDANT LAMAR MYERS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/19/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • $/POSSESSION JUDGMENT SUBMITTED TO LOWELL RICHARDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER OVER 45 DAYS WAS SET FOR 10/02/17 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. 4CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 08/18/2017 OF STANLEY NG FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • COLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less