Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 05/31/2017 at 17:26:59 (UTC).

NEWTON VS ROUND TABLE PIZZA, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/12/2012 NEWTON filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against ROUND TABLE PIZZA, INC. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1687

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RALPH NEWTON

MARIANO IBALDEZ

KAREN RIVERA

JULIE SHERICK

DAVINDER SINGH

BRIANNAH WATSON

Defendants

ROUND TABLE PIZZA,INC.

CLIFF COLLENBERG

ROUND TABLE DEVELOPMENT COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SUDANO, BRIAN D.

540 Lennon Lane

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Defendant Attorney

EMRY, CYNTHIA J

725 South Figueroa St Ste 2500

Los Angeles, CA 75408

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2013
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2013
  • CHECK FOR DISMISSAL ON CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2013
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2013
  • NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF RALPH NEWTON FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2013
  • CLERKS TICKLER FOR DISMISSAL WAS SET FOR 6/17/13 AT 7:00 ON 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2013
  • RETURN TO COURT CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2013
  • CIVIL SAD BEFORE TRIAL - REQ. DISM. - AFTER COURT-ORDERED MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2013
  • CASE DISPOSITIONED - SETTLED PER NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2013
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON STIP & ORDER FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2013
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON STIP RE: CONTINUATION OF MEDIATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2012
  • ADVANCED NON-REFUNDABLE JURY FEE PAID BY: SUDANO LAW FIRM, ON BEHALF OF PARTY: DAVINDER SINGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • ADVANCED NON-REFUNDABLE JURY FEE PAID BY: SUDANO LAW FIRM, ON BEHALF OF PARTY: MARIANO IBALDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • ADVANCED NON-REFUNDABLE JURY FEE PAID BY: SUDANO LAW FIRM, ON BEHALF OF PARTY: RALPH NEWTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/12/2012 OF RALPH NEWTON FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 11/29/12 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 9/17/12 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer EMRY CYNTHIA J.