This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 01/06/2019 at 20:50:04 (UTC).

NELSON VS LONGTON

Case Summary

On 12/13/2016 NELSON filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against LONGTON. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2325

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHRISTI NELSON

Defendants

JOHN MUIR HEALTH

WILLIAM LONGTON M.D

ASPEN SURGERY CENTER LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VENARDI, MARK L

25 Orinda Way Suite 250

Orinda, CA 94563

Defendant Attorneys

CONTI, ESQ., RICHARD J.

2420 Camino Ramon Suite 202

San Ramon, CA 94583

MALONE, BRYAN L

2021 N Street

Sacramento, CA 95811

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2019
  • JURY TRIAL - LONG CAUSE/ 10 DAY(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • ISSUE CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 09 TO 21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • 5ICC1 CALENDARED ON 08/08/19 IN DEPT. 09. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 08/08/19 IN DEPT. 21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • 5JTC1 CALENDARED ON 08/19/19 IN DEPT. 09. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 08/19/19 IN DEPT. 21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • REQUEST FILED & DISMISSAL ENTERED COMPLAINT FILED 12/13/2016 OF CHRISTI NELSON AS TO DEFENDANT ASPEN SURGERY CENTER LLC WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY WILLIAM LONGTON M.D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: WHY SANCTIONS OF $500.00 SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO APPR 5/25, PRODUCE PLTF FOR DEPO; Disposition: DISCHARGED

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 02/15/2017
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/13/2016 OF CHRISTI NELSON AS TO WILLIAM LONGTON M.D WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/09/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • IDENTIFIED OVERAGE RECEIVED FROM OVER THE AMT FOR COPIES BY $2.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/13/2016 OF CHRISTI NELSON FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS PURPLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 5/02/17 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 2/16/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.