This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 14:41:09 (UTC).

NAVARRO VS SHEA HOMES

Case Summary

On 08/17/2018 NAVARRO filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against SHEA HOMES. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1692

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LINDA JONES-SHERRY

ADAM OSBORNE

THOMAS DAVIS

CLAUDIA HUBBARD

MICHAEL PACHECO

SCOTT FOSTER

ENRIQUE NAVARRO

KERRY ATKINSON

CRYSTAL ATKINSON

JEFFREY SHERRY

ROBERTO GONZALEZ JR

GRACIELA NAVARRO

DONNA BERLIN

JACK BERLIN

SABRINA THOMAS

CASPER THOMAS

SUJAN CHAKRABORTY

PAROMITA KAR

KATHRYN OSBORNE

Defendant

SHEA HOMES, LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KENNEDY, MICHAEL T

1990 N. California Blvd Suite 1060

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Defendant Attorney

ZIMMERMAN, ESQ., JON B.

160 W. Santa Clara Street Suite 1000

San Jose, CA 95113

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketSPECIAL SET HEARING ON: STATUS OF ARBITRATION/CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET BY DEPT. 39

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketFURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketCHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketHEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR DISMISS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO COMPEL FILED BY SHEA HOMES, LP; Disposition: DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketSPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT SHEA HOMES NARRATIVE CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketREPLY ISO MOT TO DISMISS OR ALT, TO COMPEL COMP W ALT DI SPUTE RESOLUTION PROCEDURES TO STAY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY ENRIQUE NAVARRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketSPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT SHEA HOMES, LPS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS IN SUPPORT OF REPLY RE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketOBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS REQUESTS FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN FILED BY SHEA HOMES, LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketDECLARATION OF MARK R KIRKLAND FILED RE: ISO PLTFS OPPOSITION TO DEFTS MTN TO DISMISS ACT ION OR IN ALTERN TO COMPEL COMPLI

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY ENRIQUE NAVARRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketCHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: OSC ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketCOMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION FEE ON COMPLAINT FILED 08/17/2018 OF ENRIQUE NAVARRO PAID BY PLAINTIFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketCASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 08/17/2018 OF ENRIQUE NAVARRO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE IS RED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 10/19/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 39

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketCLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 10/01/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 39

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketCASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 39

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Shea Homes, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZIMMERMAN JON B.