Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/01/2017 at 21:08:28 (UTC).

MUSE VS. BROOKFIELD HOMES

Case Summary

On 11/14/2012 MUSE filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against BROOKFIELD HOMES. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2686

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DOUGLAS MUSE

AMY MUSE

JOSEPH BEGEJ

DARREN BROWN

TRACI BROWN

JOE BUI

GRACIELA BUI

RUBEN CORTEZ

SONIA CORTEZ

KENNETH FENELL

DEBRA FOGARTY

RICHARD GUZMAN

JENNIFER GUZMAN

MARK HERNANDEZ

KERRI HERNANDEZ

ROBERT HUGHLETT

MARIANNE HUGHLETT

MARIO LOYA

JULIE LOYA

WILLIAM MAGUIRE

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ADELMAN, FRED M

FLAHERTY, RAQUEL A

2800 Donald Douglas Loop North

Santa Monica, CA 90405

Other Attorneys

MERSEREAU, JOHN O

9915 Mira Mesa Boulevard Suite 300

San Diego, CA 92131

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2014
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: WHY DEFENDANTS SHOULD NOT BE SANCTIONED FOR FAILUR E TO TIMELY PAY SETTLEMENT MONIES TO PLTFS; Disposition: DROPPED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2014
  • SPECIAL SET HEARING ON: STATUS OF SETTLEMENT SET BY DEPT 9; Disposition: DROPPED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • RESPONSE TO OSC HEARING RE THE IMPOSITION OF SANCT IONS FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR & DECL OF GREGORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2014
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2014
  • CIVIL SAD BEFORE TRIAL - REQ. DISM. - NO ADR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2014
  • ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICE AS TO PLAINTIFF SONIA CORTEZ, MANDEEP SIDHU, LOUIS VERDUZCO, GISELLE HONORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICE AS TO PLAINTIFF DOUGLAS MUSE, AMY MUSE, JOSEPH BEGEJ, DARREN BROWN, TRACI BROWN, RUBEN CORTEZ, WILLIAM MAGUIRE, JACQUELINE MAGUIRE, NICK SIDHU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICE AS TO PLAINTIFF DEBRA FOGARTY, RICHARD GUZMAN, JENNIFER GUZMAN, MARK HERNANDEZ, KERRI HERNANDEZ, ROBERT HUGHLETT, MARIANNE HUGHLETT, MARIO LOYA, JULIE LOYA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO PLAINTIFF MARK TAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2012
  • NOTICE OF/TO POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY DOUGLAS MUSE, AMY MUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2012
  • ADVANCED NON-REFUNDABLE JURY FEE PAID BY: ONE LEGAL, ON BEHALF OF PARTY: DOUGLAS MUSE, AMY MUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2012
  • COMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION FEE ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/14/2012 OF DOUGLAS MUSE PAID BY PLAINTIFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/14/2012 OF DOUGLAS MUSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS PINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 1/22/13 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2012
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 12/31/12 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2012
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MERSEREAU JOHN