Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 07/28/2016 at 16:40:56 (UTC).

MORRIS V JOHNSON

Case Summary

On 05/24/2016 MORRIS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JOHNSON. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0431

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHIRLEY MORRIS

Defendant

JANIKA JOHNSON

Richmond, CA 94801

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FALAHATI, VAHISHTA

Morrill Law Firm 2175 N California Blvd Ste 424

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2016
  • DECLARATION OF VAHISHTA FALAHATI FILED RE: OSC HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: FAILURE TO DISPOSITION U.D. CASE WAS SET FOR 8/02/16 AT 13:15 IN DEPT. 54

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINERS NOT DISPOSITIONED OR IN THE COURT CONTROL WITH IN 45 DAYS; Disposition: OSC ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • DEFENDANT ANSWERED AS JOHNIKA JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • ANSWER TO UD COMPLAINT FILED 05/24/2016 OF SHIRLEY MORRIS FILED BY JANIKA JOHNSON REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY JANIKA JOHNSON (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO JANIKA JOHNSON IS GRANTED; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • HEARING SET FOR DISPOSITION DATE ON 7/08/16 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 2CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 05/24/2016 OF SHIRLEY MORRIS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS YELLOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less