This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/28/2019 at 00:45:29 (UTC).

MORAGA PROPERTIES VS. DAGO'S MARINE, ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/01/2011 MORAGA PROPERTIES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DAGO'S MARINE. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Concord Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0789

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORAGA PROPERTIES,

Defendants

RONALD CAMPAGNOLI

ANY AND ALL OTHER UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

DAGO'S MARINE ENGINEERING, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HARRINGTON, MATTHEW P

1600 S Main St, Suite 305

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2011
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) RETURNED FULLY-SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2011
  • CLERK`S CALENDAR - FAILURE TO DISPOSITION UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2011
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2011
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ON 10/11/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2011
  • ORDER TO/FOR PERMITTING CORRECTION OF JGMT/POSSESSION WRIT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2011
  • ORDER TO PERMIT CORRECTION OF JGMT & POS WRIT SUBMITTED TO COMMISSIONER CREIGHTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2011
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA RETURNED UN-SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2011
  • EX-PARTE APPLICATION TO/FOR CORRECT JGMT AND WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY MORAGA PROPERTIES,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2011
  • DECLARATION OF THERESA E DAVIES FILED RE: IN SUPPORT OF APP TO CORRECT JGMT & POSSESSION WRI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2011
  • DECLARATION OF MATTHEW P HARRINGTON FILED RE: IN SUPPORT OF APP TO CORRECT JGMT & POSSESSION WRI

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 09/01/2011 OF MORAGA PROPERTIES, AS TO DEF ENDANT RONALD CAMPAGNOLI WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/14/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2011
  • ANY AND ALL OTHER UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON ANY AND ALL OTHER UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FOR PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION SERVED ON 09/14/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 09/01/2011 OF MORAGA PROPERTIES, AS TO DEF ENDANT DAGO'S MARINE ENGINEERING, INC. WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/14/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2011
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2011
  • HEARING ON FAILURE TO DISPOSITION UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT WAS SET FOR 10/19/11 AT 17:00 IN DEPT. 3CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2011
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 09/01/2011 OF MORAGA PROPERTIES, FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2011
  • COLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2011
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2011
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARRINGTON, MATTHEW P