This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/27/2019 at 10:08:36 (UTC).

MORAGA POLICE DEPT VS SUGANUMA

Case Summary

On 08/06/2009 MORAGA POLICE DEPT filed an Infraction - Parking lawsuit against SUGANUMA. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Walnut Creek Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0398

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Infraction - Parking

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Respondents and Plaintiffs

OFFICE OF REVENUE COLLECTION

2530 Arnold Drive Suite 350

Martinez, CA 94553

MORAGA POLICE DEPARTMENT

Defendant and Appellant

LLOYD SUGANUMA

Moraga, CA 94556

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

OFFICE OF REVENUE COLLECTION

2530 Arnold Drive Suite 350

Martinez, CA 94553

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2009
  • CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF JUDGMENT ON PARKING APPEAL SENT TO THE FOLLOWING PARTIES:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2009
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED - CONTESTED COURT TRIAL FOR THE DEFENDANT ON 09/23/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2009
  • PARKING TRIAL DE NOVO; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2009
  • DOCUMENTS RE PARKING APPEAL FILED BY ORC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2009
  • CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF NOTICE OF HEARING ON PARKING APPEAL SENT TO THE FOLLOWING PARTIES:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2009
  • SCHEDULED FOR PARKING TRIAL DE NOVO ON 9/23/09 AT 10:30 IN DEPT. 59

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2009
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2009
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON PARKING APPEAL FILED 08/06/2009 OF MORAGA POLICE DEPARTMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2009
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GRAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2009
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL/REQUEST FOR TRIAL DE NOVO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less