This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/22/2017 at 15:43:52 (UTC).

MONRREAL VS. MONIZ

Case Summary

On 12/12/2016 MONRREAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MONIZ. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2358

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARISELA AGUINIGA MONRREAL

Defendants

ROSIES TOURS

ANTONIO MANUEL MONIZ

ROSE MARIE MONIZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHTYREV, DMITRI N

8500 Wilshire Blvd Suite 918

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Defendant Attorney

ANGEL, CASSANDRA

101 Montgomery Street Suite 2650

San Francisco, CA 94104

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2017
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY MARISELA AGUINIGA MONRREAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY ANTONIO MANUEL MONIZ, ROSE MARIE MONIZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • DEFENDANT/CROSS-DEFENDANT ANSWERED AS ROSE MARIE MONIZ DBA ROSIE'S TOURS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/12/2016 OF MARISELA MONRREAL, ROSE MARIE MONIZ IS REMOVED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/12/2016 OF MARISELA MONRREAL, ROSIES TOURS IS REMOVED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • (U.J.) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 12/12/2016 OF MARISELA MONRREAL FILED BY ANTONIO MANUEL MONIZ, ROSE MARIE MONIZ

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2017
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/12/2016 OF MARISELA MONRREAL AS TO ROSE MARIE MONIZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/21/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/12/2016 OF MARISELA MONRREAL AS TO ROSIES TOURS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/21/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/12/2016 OF MARISELA MONRREAL AS TO ANTONIO MANUEL MONIZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/21/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 5/01/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 2/15/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/12/2016 OF MARISELA MONRREAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS LAVENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.