This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 01/03/2017 at 12:37:04 (UTC).

MITCHELL VS HARRIS

Case Summary

On 09/19/2011 MITCHELL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HARRIS. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Walnut Creek Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0660

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LINDA MITCHELL

San Ramon, CA 94583

STEPHEN MITCHELL

San Ramon, CA 94583

Defendant

PHILIP D HARRIS

San Ramon, CA 94583

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2013
  • DocketEXHIBITS DESTROYED PURSUANT TO CCP 1952-1952.3 AFTER PROPER NOTICE TO THE PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • DocketSATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED/ENTERED ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 09/19/2011 OF LINDA MITCHELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • DocketSET JUDGMENT STATUS 0002 SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2012
  • DocketEXHIBITS IDENTIFIED AND RETURNED TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2012
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF EXHIBITS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2012
  • DocketCOPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2011
  • DocketCOPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2011
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 12/22/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT WAS MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 12/22/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2011
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 12/15/11

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2011
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2011
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2011
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 09/19/2011 OF LINDA MITCHELL AS TO DEFENDANT PHILIP D HARRIS FILED. DATE OF SERVICE 10/22/11. FEE FOR SERVICE $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2011
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Disposition: NOT HEARD-CONT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2011
  • DocketCASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2011
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE IS ORANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2011
  • DocketCLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FOR PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2011
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 10/31/11 AT 10:30 IN DEPT. 59

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2011
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM GREATER THAN $1,500.00, UP TO $5,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2011
  • DocketAMOUNT OF CLAIM: $2,410.06

    Read MoreRead Less