This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/09/2018 at 00:13:36 (UTC).

MISTY DAWN RUSK VS AUSTIN T JONES

Case Summary

On 03/12/2018 MISTY DAWN RUSK filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against AUSTIN T JONES. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1224

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MISTY DAWN RUSK

Pittsburg, CA 94565

Respondent

AUSTIN T JONES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2023
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS (DISMISSAL, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS (RESPONSE OR DEFAULT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS (PROOF OF SERVICE, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • FAMILY LAW DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: SERVICE OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE FILED BY MISTY DAWN RUSK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • FAMILY LAW REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AS TO AUSTIN T JONES FILED. DATE COPY MAILED BY CLERK TO RESPONDENT 05/04/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON DISSOLUTION WITHOUT CHILDREN FILED 03/12/2018 OF MISTY RUSK AGAINST AUSTIN T JONES BY CLERK AS REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: SERVICE OF PETITIONERS PRELIMINARY DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE FILED BY MISTY DAWN RUSK

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 6/11/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 9/10/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 3/12/19 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 9/09/19 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS WAS SET FOR 3/13/23 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • COLOR OF FILE (FAMILY LAW): LAVENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • (FAMILY LAW) SUMMONS ON DISSOLUTION WITHOUT CHILDREN FILED 03/12/2018 OF MISTY RUSK FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.