Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 05/31/2017 at 11:11:57 (UTC).

MILLS VS X MARKETING

Case Summary

On 01/05/2012 MILLS filed a Labor - Wage Claim lawsuit against X MARKETING. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0063

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wage Claim

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Appellant

X MARKETING, INC.

Respondent

JANELLE MILLS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

LAWRENCE, ROBERT K

1850 Mt. Diablo Blvd Suite 120

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Respondent Attorneys

LEE, EUMI K

100 Mcallister Street Ste 300

San Francisco, CA 94102

DOVI, SUSAN A

1515 Clay Street, Ste 801

Oakland, CA 94612

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2012
  • CHECK FOR DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2012
  • $3228.08 PLUS $1.23 INTEREST PAID TO X MARKETING I C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2012
  • REFUND MISCELLANEOUS TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2012
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2012
  • CIVIL SAD BEFORE TRIAL - REQ. DISM. - NO ADR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2012
  • ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2012
  • COURT TRIAL - SHORT CAUSE/ 1 DAY(S); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2012
  • NOTICE OF/TO ENTRY OF ORDER TO RELEASE FUNDS FILED BY X MARKETING, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2012
  • FEE RECEIVED FOR STIP AND ORDER TO RELEASE FUNDS FROM X MARKETING, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2012
  • EX-PARTE APPLICATION TO VACATE AND/OR CONTINUE TRIAL DATE FILED BY X MARKETING, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2012
  • NOTICE OF REPRESENTATION OF RESPONDENT FILED, ON THE OTHER JUDICIAL REVIEW FILED 01/05/2012 OF X MARKETING, INC., PRO/PER SUBSTITUTES OUT AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR JANELLE MILLS AND IS REPLACED BY SUSAN A DOVI.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2012
  • COURT TRIAL WAS SET FOR 2/02/12 AT 10:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2012
  • DEFENDANT JANELLE MILLS ADDS ATTORNEY PRO/PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2012
  • LABOR APPEAL TRUST MONIES POSTED BY X MARKETING, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2012
  • RECEIPT FOR MISCELLANEOUS TRUST PAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS RED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2012
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2012
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL ON ORDER, DECISION OR AWARD OF LABOR COMMISSIONER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less