This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/19/2017 at 04:35:36 (UTC).

MILLER VS. STUBNER

Case Summary

On 04/12/2017 MILLER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against STUBNER. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0098

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WILLIAM J MILLER

KAY KUGLER

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

PHILIP STUBER

PAMELA STUBER

PACIFIC UNION INTERNATIONAL, INC.

MARVIN GARDENS REAL ESTATE

LESLIE AVANT

NANCY FOSS

ROBERT DULLUM

SKYLINE INSPECTIONSERVICES

BRIAN A MANDIO

BRIAN A. MANDIO

Defendants and Cross Defendants

BRIAN A MANDIO

ARDO CONSTRUCTION

BRIAN A. MANDIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCKEOWN, FRANCIS M

2550 Ninth Street, Suite 202

Berkeley, CA 94553

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

PETERSON, P. KURT

49 Stevenson St, Tenth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

JONES, SHANNON B

208 W. El Pintado Road

Danville, CA 94526

ADAMS, DAPHINE S

50 Old Courthouse Square Suite 200

Santa Rosa, CA 95404

MCCARTHY, KEVIN P

492 Ninth Street Ste 220

Oakland, CA 94612

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

MCCARTHY, KEVIN P

492 Ninth Street Ste 220

Oakland, CA 94612

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2017
  • SPECIAL SET HEARING ON: ARBITRATION REVIEW HEARING SET BY WILLIAM J. MILLER AND KAY KUGLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • SPECIAL SET HEARING ON: ARBITRATION REVIEW HEARING SET BY WILLIAM J. MILLER AND KAY KUGLER; Disposition: Complete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY WILLIAM J MILLER, KAY KUGLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • (U.J.) ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 04/12/2017 OF PHILIP STUBER FILED BY BRIAN A. MANDIO, BRIAN A MANDIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF DEF ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT. DATE OF MAILING 05/22/17 FILED BY DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • (U.J.) ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF WILLIAM MILLER FILED BY BRIAN A. MANDIO, BRIAN A MANDIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR QUASH FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION FILED BY BRIAN A. MANDIO, BRIAN A MANDIO; Disposition: DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DEFTS BRIAN N MANDIOS & BRIAN A MANDIO DBA MANDIO & SONS CONSTRUCTIONS REPLY ISO MTN TO QUASH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • OPPOSITION TO QUASH SVC FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION & MTN TO DISMIS FILED BY PLAINTIFFS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 04/12/2017 OF PHILIP STUBER AS TO DEF/X-DFT BRIAN A MANDIO, MANDIO & SONS CONSTRUCTION ADDED AS AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2015
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY WILLIAM J MILLER, KAY KUGLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • HEARING ON OSC WAS SET FOR 6/03/15 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: OSC ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/15/2015 OF WILLIAM MILLER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GREEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 6/03/15 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 3/23/15 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 21

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.