This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/09/2018 at 01:46:50 (UTC).

MIKE M. MAGAGNINI VS LISA A. REIMERS

Case Summary

On 03/26/2018 MIKE M MAGAGNINI filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LISA A REIMERS. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1506

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MIKE M. MAGAGNINI

Respondent

LISA A. REIMERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WOLCH, JOSEPH H

100 Pringle Avenue Suite 200

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2023
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS (DISMISSAL, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS (RESPONSE OR DEFAULT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS (PROOF OF SERVICE, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • (F/L) PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON DISSOLUTION WITH CHILDREN FILED 03/26/2018 OF MIKE MAGAGNINI AS TO LISA A. REIMERS (SERVED ON 03/29/18)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • --RELATED CASE NUMBER IS: D13-04587

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS WAS SET FOR 3/27/23 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • COLOR OF FILE (FAMILY LAW): RED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • (FAMILY LAW) SUMMONS ON DISSOLUTION WITH CHILDREN FILED 03/26/2018 OF MIKE MAGAGNINI FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 6/25/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 9/24/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 3/26/19 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 9/23/19 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 22

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.