Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/28/2019 at 13:31:49 (UTC).

MIDLAND VS HEREDIA

Case Summary

On 08/23/2012 MIDLAND filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HEREDIA. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********5774

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

LUIS HEREDIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BRACHFELD, ERICA L.

BROWN, TIMOTHY S.

2700 Iowa Avenue #3

Riverside, CA 92507

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2013
  • CLERK'S TICKLER ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CASE - CHECK FOR FILING OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN 360 DAYS OF FILING COMPLAINT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2013
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED. ERICA L. BRACHFELD SUBSTITUTES OUT AS ATTORNEY FOR MIDLAND FUNDING LLC AND IS REPLACED BY TIMOTHY S. BROWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2013
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • CLERK'S TICKLER ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CASE - CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE FILED WITHIN 180 DAYS OF FILING COMPLAINT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2012
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED AS TO ALL REMAINING DOES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2012
  • DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF FILED RE: CALCULATION OF INTEREST / WAIVER OF ATTY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2012
  • DECLARATION 585D CCP FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2012
  • JUDGMENT FILED/ENTERED-BEFORE TRIAL ON 11/06/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2012
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CMPL (CRC 3.740) FILED 08/23/2012 OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC FILED AS TO LUIS HEREDIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2012
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON THE CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CMPL (CRC 3.740) FILED 08/23/2012 OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC AGAINST DEFENDANT LUIS HEREDIA BY CLERK AS REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2012
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CMPL (CRC 3.740) FILED 08/23/2012 OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC AS TO LUIS HEREDIA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/26/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • PLACED ON CLERK'S TICKLER CALENDAR FOR 2/20/13, AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • PLACED ON CLERK'S TICKLER CALENDAR FOR 8/19/13, AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CMPL (CRC 3.740) FILED 08/23/2012 OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE: PINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • DECLARATION OF ERICA L BRACHFELD FILED RE: JURISDICTIONAL FACTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED; SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 31

    Read MoreRead Less