This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 07/18/2017 at 04:04:40 (UTC).

MENLO WESTRIDGE VS LAWSON

Case Summary

On 01/28/2015 MENLO WESTRIDGE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LAWSON. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0083

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2015
  • DocketCHECK FOR DISMISSAL; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • DocketREQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • DocketCIVIL SAD BEFORE TRIAL - REQ. DISM. - NO ADR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • DocketENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • DocketHEARING ON OSC RE: FAILURE TO DISPOSITION U.D.CASEWITHIN 45 DAYS; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • DocketCLERK`S TICKLER DATE WAS SET FOR 7/14/15 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 2CLK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF/TO CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED BY MENLO WESTRIDGE AFFORDABLE PARTNERS, LP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • DocketHEARING ON OSC RE: FAILURE TO DISPOSITION U.D. CASE WAS SET FOR 4/07/15 AT 13:15 IN DEPT. 57

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2015
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINERS NOT DISPOSITIONED OR IN THE COURT CONTROL WITH IN 45 DAYS; Disposition: OSC ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • DocketHEARING SET FOR DISPOSITION DATE ON 3/14/15 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 2CLK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 01/28/2015 OF MENLO WESTRIDGE AFFORDABLE PARTNERS, LP FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE IS PURPLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less