Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 05/01/2019 at 03:23:43 (UTC).

MENLO WESTRIDGE V NELSON

Case Summary

On 07/28/2016 MENLO WESTRIDGE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against NELSON. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0632

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MENLO WESTRIDGE AFFORDABLE PARTNERS, LP

Defendant

JEANNINE E. NELSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDERSON, SELVEN

100 Saratoga Avenue, Suite 200

Santa Clara, CA 95051

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2016
  • RETURNED WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY RETURNED FULLY SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINERS NOT DISPOSITIONED OR IN THE COURT CONTROL WITH IN 45 DAYS; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • ORDER TO/FOR AMENDING THE COMPLIANT,JUDGMENT AND WRIT NUNC PRO TUNC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • DECLARATION OF ANNE COONROD FILED RE: IN SUPPORT OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • EX-PARTE APPLICATION TO/FOR TO AMEND COMPLAINT, JUDGMENT AND WRIT FILED BY MENLO WESTRIDGE AFFORDABLE PARTNERS, LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ON 08/03/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • DECLARATION OF TODD ROTHBARD FILED RE: DAILY RENTAL VALUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 07/28/2016 OF MENLO WESTRIDGE AFFORDABLE PARTNERS, LP FILED AS TO DEFENDANT JEANNINE E. NELSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON THE UD COMPLAINT FILED 07/28/2016 OF MENLO WESTRIDGE AFFORDABLE PARTNERS, LP AGAINST DEFENDANT JEANNINE E. NELSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED AS TO ALL REMAINING DOES ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 07/28/2016 OF MENLO WESTRIDGE AFFORDABLE PARTNERS, LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 07/28/2016 OF MENLO WESTRIDGE AFFORDABLE PARTNERS, LP AS TO DEF ENDANT JEANNINE E. NELSON WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/28/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • HEARING SET FOR DISPOSITION DATE ON 9/13/16 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 2CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 07/28/2016 OF MENLO WESTRIDGE AFFORDABLE PARTNERS, LP FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GOLDENROD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less