This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/25/2019 at 06:18:39 (UTC).

MENDOZA VS MONIZ

Case Summary

On 06/30/2016 MENDOZA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MONIZ. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0436

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BIENVEMAR MENDOZA

Pittsburg, CA 94565

Defendants

STEVE MONIZ

Oakley, CA 94561

MARCELLA MONIZ

Oakley, CA 94561

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2016
  • RETURNED MAIL: SC JUDGMENT RETURNED BY USPO ATTEMPT UNKNOWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 08/08/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT WAS MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 08/08/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • STIPULATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CRAIG L. JUDSON AS TEMPORARY JUDGE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT ENTERED BY DEFAULT ON 08/08/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: ORDERED I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 06/30/2016 OF BIENVEMAR MENDOZA FOR DEFENDANT STEVE MONIZ. DATE OF SERVICE 07/08/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED UNSERVED ON THE CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 06/30/2016 OF BIENVEMAR MENDOZA AS TO DEFENDANT MARCELLA MONIZ. RETURNED LETTER IN CASE FILE. REASON NOT SERVED MOVED LFT NO ADDRESS UNABLE TO FORWARD RTN SENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • COPY OF SMALL CLAIMS CLAIM AND ORDER ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 06/30/2016 OF BIENVEMAR MENDOZA SENT CERTIFIED MAIL BY CLERK THIS DATE TO: MARCELLA MONIZ, STEVE MONIZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • A SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL WAS SET FOR 8/08/16 AT 8:45 IN DEPT. 57

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM UP TO $1,500.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM: $505.00

    Read MoreRead Less