Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/15/2017 at 23:52:37 (UTC).

MENDOZA VS CONTRA COSTA COUNTY

Case Summary

On 09/15/2014 MENDOZA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CONTRA COSTA COUNTY. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2549

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Defendants and Cross Defendants

JOSE MENDOZA

LENA MENDOZA

GRAY HYNES

CONTRA COSTA COUNTY

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

CALIFORNIA VICTIM COMPENSATIONAND

CONTRA COSTA PUBLIC WORKS

CONTRA COSTA TRANSPORTATI ON AUTHORITY

EL SOBRANTE-MUNICIPAL

STATE BOARD OF CONTROL GOVERNMENT CLAIMS

CALIFORNIA HIGHWAYPATROL

CONTRA COSTATRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY

EL SOBRANTE-MUNICIPALITY

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

COUNTY OF CONTRA COSTA

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

COUNTY OF CONTRA COSTA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PARMENTER, LIGIA M

501 B Street Suite 200

San Rafael, CA 94901

WELTIN, PHILIP R

1432 Martin Luther King Jr Way

Oakland, CA 94612

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

LITTLE, JEANETTE N

353 Sacramento Street 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

ANDERSON, SHARON L.

651 Pine Street P.O. Box 69

Martinez, CA 94553

RADKE, DYLAN

611 Las Junta St Po Box 630

Martinez, CA 94553

CRAMER, HELEN Y

111 Grand Avenue Suite 11-100

Oakland, CA 94612

FONG, WIL

1515 Clay Street, 20Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94612-0550

BEALS, RONALD W.

595 Market St., Ste. 1700

San Francisco, CA 94105

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

ANDERSON, SHARON L.

651 Pine Street P.O. Box 69

Martinez, CA 94553

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2017
  • CHECK FOR ORDER/JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF CCC FROM SJ MOTION; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • CHECK FOR ORDER/JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF CCC FROM SJ MOTION; Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • JURY TRIAL - LONG CAUSE/ 10 DAY(S); Disposition: DROPPED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • ISSUE CONFERENCE; Disposition: OFF-CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • DISMISSAL FILED/ENTERED ON THE COMPLAINT OF HYNES AND CROSS-COMPLAINT OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF IN THE ALTERNATIVE SMRY ADJUDICATION FILED BY CONTRA COSTA COUNTY; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • NOTICE OF/TO SETTLEMENT WITH PLAINTIFF GRAY HYNES ONLY FILED BY CONTRA COSTA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
127 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2013
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY LENA MENDOZA (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2013
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO JOSE MENDOZA IS GRANTED IN WHOLE; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2013
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO LENA MENDOZA IS GRANTED IN WHOLE; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2013
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2013
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/03/2013 OF JOSE MENDOZA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2013
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GRAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2013
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2013
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2013
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 2/28/14 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2013
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 1/17/14 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA VICTIM COMPENSATION BOARD is a litigant

Latest cases where CONTRA COSTA COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDERSON, SHARON L.