This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/24/2019 at 22:26:00 (UTC).

MEHAN VS MALDONADO

Case Summary

On 03/22/2012 MEHAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MALDONADO. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Walnut Creek Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0208

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Walnut Creek Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ERNEST A. MEHAN JR

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

GLORIA MEHAN

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

Defendant

GARY MALDONADO

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2013
  • RETURNED WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED ON 02/21/13 TO ALAMEDA COUNTY FILED. RETURNED NOT SATISFIED. IF PARTIAL, SUM OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO ALAMEDA COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $9,600.00; Disposition: WRIT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2012
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2012
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $9,600.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 05/16/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2012
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT WAS MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 05/16/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT ENTERED BY DEFAULT ON 05/03/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2012
  • SUBSTITUTE PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 03/22/2012 OF ERNEST MEHAN AS TO GARY MALDONADO FILED. DATE OF MAILING 04/19/12. FEE FOR SERVICE $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2012
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 5/03/12 AT 10:30 IN DEPT. 59

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2012
  • CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FOR PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2012
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM: $9,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2012
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM GREATER THAN $5,000.00, UP TO $10,000.00 - BY NATURAL PERSONS ONLY)

    Read MoreRead Less