This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 07/21/2017 at 13:57:45 (UTC).

MCCULLOUGH VS MAYNE

Case Summary

On 06/30/2016 MCCULLOUGH filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MAYNE. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0326

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PERRY TODD MCCULLOUGH

Citrus Heights, CA 95621

Defendant

CYNTHIA ANN MAYNE

Vallejo, CA 94590

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2017
  • DECLARATION OF ROBIN HILL FILED RE: SMALL CLAIMS ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • HEARING ON SMALL CLAIMS MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT; Disposition: SETTLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MOTION TO VACATE SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • HEARING ON SMALL CLAIMS MOTION TO VACATE JUDGEMENT WAS SET FOR 1/11/17 AT 13:15 IN DEPT. 54

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS MOTION TO VACATE FILED BY CYNTHIA ANN MAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 10/28/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT ENTERED BY DEFAULT ON 10/26/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: Continued - Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • SUBSTITUTE PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 06/30/2016 OF PERRY MCCULLOUGH AS TO CYNTHIA ANN MAYNE FILED. DATE OF MAILING 09/20/16. FEE FOR SERVICE $79.00

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: Continued - Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • SERVICE ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 06/30/2016 OF PERRY MCCULLOUGH CYNTHIA ANN MAYNE IS QUESTIONABLE FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: PERSON NOT NAMED DEFENDANT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • COPY OF SMALL CLAIMS CLAIM AND ORDER ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 06/30/2016 OF PERRY MCCULLOUGH SENT CERTIFIED MAIL BY CLERK THIS DATE TO: CYNTHIA ANN MAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS PINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY PERRY TODD MCCULLOUGH (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO PERRY TODD MCCULLOUGH IS GRANTED; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL WAS SET FOR 8/29/16 AT 13:15 IN DEPT. 54

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM GREATER THAN $5,000.00, UP TO $10,000.00 - BY NATURAL PERSONS ONLY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM $8,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.