This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/23/2017 at 20:14:35 (UTC).

MATTER OF TRI-VALLEY GASTROENTEROLOGY CENTER

Case Summary

On 04/03/2017 MATTER OF TRI-VALLEY GASTROENTEROLOGY CENTER was filed as a Contract - Business Governance lawsuit. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1269

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business Governance

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Respondents and Appellants

SAN RAMON ENDOSCOPY CENTER, INC

DAVID WONG

Petitioners, Cross Defendants and Appellants

DAVID WONG MD

SAN RAMON ENDOSCOPY CENTER, INC

DAVID WONG

TRI-VALLEY GASTROENTEROLOGY MEDICAL CENTER,

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

SALIM SHELBY MD

EXECUTIVE SUGERY CENTER INC

TRI-VALLEY GASTROENTEROLOGY MEDICAL CENTER,

EXECUTIVE GASTROENTEROLOGY SERVICES

LYNNE BARTLE

ADAM JOHNSTON

ANTHONY VON POSSEL

AMY MURPHY

MARY ELDER

SALIM SHELBY M.D.

GIMD LLC

PEGGY MARTIN

SAN RAMON ENDOSCOPY CENTER, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Respondent, Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

FINKEL, LONNIE

300 Lakeside Dr. Suite 1000

Oakland, CA 94612

GREEN, MITCHELL J

50 California St, 34Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

JUDSON, CRAIG L

500 Ygnacio Valley Rd #325

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

RHOADS, STEVEN R

14 Sailmaker Ct

San Rafael, CA 94903-2248

Appellant Attorney

APPLEGATE, DOUGLAS A

601 Montgomery Street Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant, Respondent, Cross Plaintiff and Plaintiff Attorneys

MCCOY, GREGORY L.

279 Front Street Po Box 218

Danville, CA 94526

GREEN, MITCHELL J

50 California St, 34Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

FINKEL, LONNIE

300 Lakeside Dr. Suite 1000

Oakland, CA 94612

Defendant, Respondent and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

MCCOY, GREGORY L.

279 Front Street Po Box 218

Danville, CA 94526

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2018
  • JURY TRIAL - LONG CAUSE/ 30 DAY(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • ISSUE CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Complete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • UPDATE 4TH AMENDED COMPLAINT OF DAVID WONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • ANSWER TO 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE: MTN TO STRIKE 4TH AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • ORDER RE DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE THE FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO ALLOW FILING OF ANSWER TO THIRD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • TO 103 - ORDER MTN TO STRIKE

    Read MoreRead Less
638 More Docket Entries
  • 08/27/2012
  • DECLARATION OF MITCHELL J. GREEN RE: PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • HEARING ON OSC WAS SET FOR 9/06/12 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR OSC RE APPOINTMENT OF PROVISIONAL DIRCTORS FILED BY DAVID WONG MD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • OSC TO/FOR APPOINTMENT OF PROVISIONAL DIRECTORS FILED BY DAVID WONG MD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 08/14/2012 OF DAVID WONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 08/14/2012 OF DAVID WONG FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS PURPLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • PETITION TO/FOR APPOINTMENT OF PROVISIONAL DIRECTORS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.