This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/27/2019 at 01:36:34 (UTC).

MATTER OF JOHN WOOD SPECIAL NEEDS TRUST

Case Summary

On 03/19/2019 MATTER OF JOHN WOOD SPECIAL NEEDS TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1411

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MICHAEL GARDNER

Not Classified By Court

JOHN WOOD SPECIAL NEEDS TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

POLING, SCOTT E

1330 Arnold Drive Ste 252

Martinez, CA 94553

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2019
  • HEARING RE: SECOND ACCT AND RPT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE AND PETITION FOR ITS STLMT FILED ON 03/19/19 BY MICHAEL GARDNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 2ND ACCT AND REPORT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE FILED (6/11/19 9:00 D14) WITH POS BY MAIL ON 3/25/19 TO - SEE LIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • HEARING WAS SET FOR 6/11/19 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • FEE RECEIVED FOR SECOND ACCT AND REPORT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE FROM MICHAEL GARDNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • SUBSEQUENT PETITION SECOND ACCT AND RPT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE FILED BY MICHAEL GARDNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • ORDER SETTLING FIRST ACCT & RPT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • HEARING RE: FIRST ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE AND PTN FOR SETTLEMENT FILED ON 03/08/17 BY MICHAEL GARDNER; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • DECLARATION OF ATTORNEY SCOTT E POLING FILED RE: IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • DECLARATION OF FIDUCIARY MICHAEL R GARDNER FILED RE: IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR TRUSTEE FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON FIRST ACCT AND REPORT FILED (4/20/17 D14 @9AM) WITH PROOF OF MAILING SEE LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2017
  • SUBSEQUENT PETITION 1ST ACCT & RPT OF TRUSTEE; PTN FOR SETTLEMENT FILED BY MICHAEL GARDNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • END OF TRANSFER-IN; FOR COMPLETE LIST OF ALL DOCUMENTS SEE CASE HISTORY FROM PREVIOUS COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF RECORD ON TRANSFER SENT TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • THE MAIN DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED IN THE TRANSFERRED RECORD ARE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • TRANSFERRED-IN COMPLAINT/PETITION TO/FOR TRANSFER OF VENUE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • ORDER FOR TRANSFER OF VENUE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • PROBATE RECORD ON TRANSFER FROM ALAMEDA COUNTY FILED (PRIOR CASE NO. P-253255); TRANSFER FEE RECEIVED FROM POLING AND POLING

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.